Accounts and annual returns ST NICHOLAS WORLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1125836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window