THE POLDEN HILL GWILLIAM CHARITY FOR ANIMAL CARE

Charity number: 1126746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.22k £5.09k £7.06k £6.80k £55.19k
Total expenditure £1.03k £1.87k £977 £1.82k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A