POLISH & EASTERN EUROPEAN CHRISTIAN FAMILY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1126136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 December 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 December 2017 50 days late Download