POLISH & EASTERN EUROPEAN CHRISTIAN FAMILY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1126136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £57.44k £61.36k £63.06k £70.50k £79.14k
Total expenditure £57.17k £57.07k £61.89k £72.20k £81.99k
Income from government contracts £42.86k £57.14k £47.00k N/A £30.00k
Income from government grants £0 £1.68k N/A £37.40k N/A