Financial history ZAWIA NAQSHBANDIA MUJADDADIA TRUST

Charity number: 1127520
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.40k £2.54k £112.77k £171.78k £38.74k
Total expenditure £2.38k £2.54k £33.28k £6.86k £22.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.24k