THE SIMPSON MCCREATH TRUST

Charity number: 1126805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.40k £9.22k £24.90k £17.65k £18.36k
Total expenditure £8.40k £9.22k £24.91k £17.76k £10.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A