Trustees STONYHURST
Charity number: 1127929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY CHITNIS | Chair | 10 May 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Aileen Brady | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Foulds | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Dodd | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Lagerberg | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kuenen | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Glassbrook | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roger Dawson | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr NUALA MELLOWS | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Finn | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Alicia Josephina Guzkowska | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev MATTHEW POWER SJ | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.