Financial history DIVYA SEVA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £32.66k £2.15k £710 £4.81k £16.11k
Total expenditure £876 £6.65k £3.42k £9.12k £7.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A