MALARIA NO MORE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1126222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time Download