MULTI AGENCY INTERNATIONAL TRAINING AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 1126268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £95.92k £125.50k £171.83k £170.53k £90.23k
Total expenditure £95.43k £123.97k £126.54k £108.04k £136.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A