Financial history FRIENDS OF BISTERNE CHURCH

Charity number: 1126261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.09k £51 £912 £5.26k £1.75k
Total expenditure £0 £2.00k £2.00k £7.09k £3.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A