ST MARY'S SCHOOL FRENSHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1126115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.82k £4.71k £3.54k £1.28k £785
Total expenditure £216 £216 £216 £216 £216
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A