Financial history STOP THE TRAFFIK

Charity number: 1127321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £576.95k £631.23k £844.61k £869.15k £1.39m
Total expenditure £441.27k £563.88k £713.70k £826.33k £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £57.00k £24.14k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £100.00k £124.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £507.14k £559.25k £741.93k £695.89k £949.23k
Income - Other trading activities £1.34k £427 £218 £807 £0
Income - Charitable activities £68.47k £71.55k £102.46k £172.45k £438.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £506.48k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £436.03k £553.22k £711.16k £814.47k £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.24k £10.65k £2.54k £11.85k £20.01k
Expenditure - Governance £1.06k £1.05k £3.25k £3.40k £7.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0