Financial history HERNE BAY PIER TRUST

Charity number: 1128253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £183.71k £112.21k £152.20k £172.09k £140.60k
Total expenditure £122.16k £147.87k £148.98k £177.24k £134.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £42.49k £73.32k £10.79k