DATUS ENABLING RECOVERY

Charity number: 1126901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £112.42k £126.96k £115.44k £128.06k £178.78k
Total expenditure £102.89k £116.91k £126.66k £133.68k £129.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £126.86k £115.44k N/A N/A