KIELDER WATER AND FOREST PARK DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1139328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £282.52k £429.47k £496.83k £537.16k £346.07k
Total expenditure £284.83k £423.76k £495.40k £526.97k £303.81k
Income from government contracts £75.40k £76.07k £77.49k £73.87k £78.06k
Income from government grants £10.00k £4.05k N/A £59.02k £23.90k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £397.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £5.34k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £133.92k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £525.24k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.73k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.52k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A