THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF RADICALISATION AND POLITICAL VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1135014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 June 2017 On time Download