PEOPLE TREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £29.73k £2.22k £2.15k £864 £1.37k
Total expenditure £19.39k £2.46k £12.97k £5.66k £4.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A