THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF LAMBOURNE CHURCH

Charity number: 1126857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required