THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF LAMBOURNE CHURCH

Charity number: 1126857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.33k £36.02k £26.32k £4.39k £4.91k
Total expenditure £17.80k £30.72k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A