GREYHOUND WALKS

Charity number: 1127875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 Not Required