GREYHOUND WALKS

Charity number: 1127875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.46k £13.34k £12.56k £11.76k £11.59k
Total expenditure £8.15k £13.98k £15.59k £7.71k £15.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A