Financial history EUROPEAN VETERINARY DENTAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1128783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £83.49k £103.27k £113.83k £51.56k £37.86k
Total expenditure £61.12k £57.54k £91.86k £15.91k £55.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A