HEAVEN GATE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1126680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.01k £8.85k £11.53k £13.57k £7.12k
Total expenditure £20.68k £6.72k £11.33k £13.37k £11.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A