THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139440
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 06 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 06 May 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)