ROOTED IN

Charity number: 1126786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 11 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 16 March 2017 On time Download