Trustees SIDNEY WEST CENTRE CHARITY
Charity number: 1129153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Cherry | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Ellis | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Miles-eves | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hicks | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cornish | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Laing | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diane Heckels | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.