Accounts and annual returns AL-HAFEEZ WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1128428
Charity reporting is overdue by 538 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 538 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 538 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 March 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required