Dogfen lywodraethu Venturers Trust Endowment Fund
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 02 MAY 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 THROUGH (1) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE SCHOOLS (2) THE SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES ANYWHERE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (3) THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST THEM IN PURSUING THEIR EDUCATION EITHER AT THE SCHOOLS OR ELSEWHERE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BRISTOL CITY.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.