EUROPEAN ACADEMY FOR JEWISH LITURGY

Charity number: 1127733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 08 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required