EUROPEAN ACADEMY FOR JEWISH LITURGY

Charity number: 1127733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £21.87k £10.84k £23.89k £19.46k £12.71k
Total expenditure £25.03k £6.46k £15.16k £18.03k £7.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A