MAD 4 AFRICA

Charity number: 1127976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required