Financial history WHITEHALL DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1131552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £132.89k £190.73k £106.33k £148.70k £190.50k
Total expenditure £130.89k £129.24k £151.75k £162.95k £131.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £9.98k