SOUTH HAMPSTEAD AND KILBURN COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1128207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £198.42k £205.27k £270.37k £206.09k £271.47k
Total expenditure £182.99k £162.64k £239.37k £214.87k £221.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £53.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.17k £41.43k £121.29k £94.30k £170.24k