Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN TOWNSEND TRUST

Charity number: 1127209
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021
Annual return 31 July 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020
Annual return 31 July 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019
Annual return 31 July 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018
Annual return 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1578 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1578 days