ROOM TO HEAL

Charity number: 1128857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £214.02k £222.95k £231.18k £265.58k £273.62k
Total expenditure £167.03k £206.75k £260.79k £246.81k £262.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.65k £0 N/A N/A