HARMONY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1129290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £58.08k £63.28k £61.25k £53.59k £72.98k
Total expenditure £55.11k £59.15k £57.25k £54.94k £68.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £20.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £20.00k N/A