Financial history THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN - BOURNEMOUTH COASTAL AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity number: 1134540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £128.75k £101.23k £101.23k £136.35k £58.63k
Total expenditure £83.33k £107.97k £108.78k £151.40k £122.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £644