Accounts and annual returns BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION OF ZOOS AND AQUARIUMS

Charity number: 1128168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window