Financial history BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION OF ZOOS AND AQUARIUMS

Charity number: 1128168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £422.00k £397.68k £442.18k £236.13k £387.92k
Total expenditure £452.30k £353.42k £506.89k £354.54k £325.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.86k