Trustees BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION OF ZOOS AND AQUARIUMS
Charity number: 1128168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Ian Christon | Chair | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mallott | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Forsythe | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tyler Whitnall | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Rowden | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Romain Pizzi | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Zak Jon Showell | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Andrew Brown | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Habben | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stevie Jay Sheppard | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Mary Macdonald | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Owen | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christoph Schwitzer | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Field | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Smout | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terri Elizabeth Hill | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Bowkett | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.