AL-QAYOOM FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1129424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.95k £37.93k £30.32k £39.70k £17.79k
Total expenditure £23.52k £29.18k £19.73k £14.45k £14.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A