ST LEONARDS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1129970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 August 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 August 2020 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 February 2017 On time Download