ST LEONARDS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1129970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £132.96k £267.63k £249.95k £279.77k £457.66k
Total expenditure £115.37k £260.30k £246.70k £268.57k £382.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £69.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.27k £69.86k N/A £15.85k £86.90k