Trustees THE DUCHENNE FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1128653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Henry Meech | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Elizabeth Revell | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacky Wilde | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Virginia Thomas | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Lightly | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wright | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elliott | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Berry | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.