EXETER FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1128795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 22 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 26 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 17 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 17 August 2017 On time Download