Trustees THE INSPIRE AND ACHIEVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Peace-Gadsby Chair 09 October 2014
YOUTH UNITED FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RIDERS MINDS
Recently registered
FRIENDS OF NEWARK CASTLE AND VICTORIAN GARDENS
Recently registered
MATTHEW WILLIAM ROONEY Trustee 08 November 2021
COPE CHILDRENS TRUST
Received: On time
Keith William Rodgers Trustee 20 January 2016
None on record
Yvonne Card Trustee 08 June 2015
None on record
Andrew Maree Tucker Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record