Financial history EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF OPTOMETRY AND OPTICS

Charity number: 1134105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £144.87k £51.53k £56.52k £29.42k £28.53k
Total expenditure £150.62k £22.32k £20.74k £21.17k £10.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A