EDUCATION WEST AFRICA

Charity number: 1130223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required