HARLOW HILLTOP PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1129463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download